CT HB05347 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-02 - File Number 397
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-02 - File Number 397
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To prevent people who are allergic to latex from coming into contact with latex without their knowledge.
Title
An Act Prohibiting The Use Of Natural Rubber Latex Gloves At Retail Food Establishments.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-02 | House | File Number 397 |
2015-04-02 | House | House Calendar Number 255 |
2015-04-02 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-04-02 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-27 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/15 5:00 PM |
2015-03-24 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-23 | House | Joint Favorable |
2015-03-17 | House | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Public Health |
2015-03-16 | House | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Public Health |
2015-03-13 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-13 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-12 | House | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Public Health |
2015-03-10 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |
2015-03-09 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2015-02-26 | House | Vote to Draft |
2015-01-27 | House | Public Hearing 02/03 |
2015-01-14 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |