CT HB05347 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-26 - File Number 161
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-26 - File Number 161
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To lower the incidence of drug overdoses.
Title
An Act Concerning Prescription Drug Labels.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-26 | House | File Number 161 |
2013-03-26 | House | House Calendar Number 124 |
2013-03-26 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-03-26 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-19 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/13 5:00 PM |
2013-03-14 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-12 | House | Joint Favorable |
2013-03-05 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |
2013-03-04 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2013-02-21 | House | Vote to Draft |
2013-02-01 | House | Public Hearing 02/07 |
2013-01-31 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2013-01-17 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |