CT HB05327 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 28 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-30 - File Number 625
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-30 - File Number 625
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To (1) prohibit the towing of occupied vehicles, (2) increase the penalty regarding the improper use of a motor vehicle registration, (3) provide guidance to school bus owners or operators regarding the daily inspection of a school bus, and (4) make a technical revision to a motor vehicle statute.
Title
An Act Revising Motor Vehicle Statutes Concerning Towing Occupied Vehicles And The Operation And Inspection Of School Buses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-22 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet-A (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | House | File Number 625 |
2024-04-30 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-30 | House | New File by Committee on Judiciary |
2024-04-30 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-23 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/29/24 5:00 PM |
2024-04-23 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-22 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2024-04-16 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary |
2024-04-08 | House | File Number 328 |
2024-04-08 | House | House Calendar Number 223 |
2024-04-08 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-08 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-01 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/24 12:00 PM |
2024-03-21 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-20 | House | Joint Favorable |
2024-02-29 | House | Public Hearing 03/04 |
2024-02-28 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation |