CT HB05315 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-27 - File Number 739
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-27 - File Number 739
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To prevent the habituation of potentially dangerous animals, including, but not limited to, bears and to require the posting of notices in state parks and forests concerning actions people should take when they encounter a bear or other wildlife and to extend prohibitions concerning the sale or exchange of certain wild animals to snapping turtles.
Title
An Act Concerning The Habituation Of Bears And Coyotes On Property Not Owned By The State.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-26 - House - House Roll Call Vote 124 AS AMENDED (Y: 124 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-27 | Senate | File Number 739 |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 515 |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate |
2016-04-26 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2016-04-26 | House | Amendment Withdrawn, House Amendment Schedule B 4939 |
2016-04-26 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4848 |
2016-03-22 | House | File Number 114 |
2016-03-22 | House | House Calendar Number 108 |
2016-03-22 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-03-22 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-16 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/16 5:00 PM |
2016-03-07 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-04 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2016-02-19 | House | Public Hearing 02/24 |
2016-02-18 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |