CT HB05313 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To require that temporary nursing services agencies register with the Department of Public Health and that the Department of Social Services set maximum rates for such services provided to nursing homes.
Title
An Act Concerning Temporary Nursing Services Agencies, Reporting Of Involuntary Transfers And Discharges From Nursing Homes And Residential Care Homes, Elder Abuse Training, Legal Rights Of Long-term Care Applicants And A Study Of Managed Residential Community Issues.
Sponsors
House Aging Committee | Rep. Geraldo Reyes [D] | Rep. Kenneth Gucker [D] | Rep. Jane Garibay [D] |
Sen. Saud Anwar [D] | Rep. Kathleen McCarty [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 363 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - House - House Roll Call Vote 75 AS AMENDED (Y: 129 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Joint - AGE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - House - House Roll Call Vote 75 AS AMENDED (Y: 129 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Joint - AGE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2022-05-17 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2022-05-17 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2022-05-10 | House | Public Act 22-57 |
2022-05-04 | House | In Concurrence |
2022-05-04 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2022-05-04 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2022-04-22 | House | File Number 593 |
2022-04-22 | House | Senate Calendar Number 433 |
2022-04-22 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-20 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2022-04-20 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4953 |
2022-04-13 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-13 | House | No New File by Committee on Public Health |
2022-04-13 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-13 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-13 | House | Joint Favorable |
2022-04-06 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Public Health |
2022-03-28 | House | File Number 132 |
2022-03-28 | House | House Calendar Number 141 |
2022-03-28 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-03-28 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-21 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/22 12:00 PM |
2022-03-11 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-10 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2022-03-04 | House | Public Hearing 03/08 |
2022-03-03 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |