CT HB05277 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To extend the municipal option to provide property tax relief to retired volunteer firefighters.
Title
An Act Extending The Municipal Property Tax Relief To Retired Volunteer Firefighters, Fire Police Officers And Emergency Medical Technicians.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 349 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 353 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - House - House Roll Call Vote 54 AS AMENDED (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 353 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - House - House Roll Call Vote 54 AS AMENDED (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-01 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2016-05-18 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2016-05-18 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2016-05-16 | House | Public Act 16-99 |
2016-05-04 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2016-05-04 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2016-05-04 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2016-04-21 | House | File Number 694 |
2016-04-21 | House | Senate Calendar Number 456 |
2016-04-21 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-19 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2016-04-19 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 3832 |
2016-04-05 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-04-05 | House | No New File by Committee on Planning and Development |
2016-04-05 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-05 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-04 | House | Joint Favorable |
2016-03-29 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Planning and Development |
2016-03-24 | House | File Number 176 |
2016-03-24 | House | House Calendar Number 141 |
2016-03-24 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-03-24 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-18 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/23/16 5:00 PM |
2016-03-10 | House | Joint Favorable |
2016-03-10 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-02-22 | House | Public Hearing 03/01 |
2016-02-17 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |