CT HB05277 | 2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-25 - Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-25 - Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To increase rates paid to adult day care centers.
Title
An Act Concerning Funding For Adult Day Care Centers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-25 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations | |
2010-03-24 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations | |
2010-03-24 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-22 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-18 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Appropriations | |
2010-03-16 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Human Services | |
2010-03-15 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Human Services | |
2010-03-15 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-11 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-11 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Human Services | |
2010-03-01 | Public Hearing 03/09 | |
2010-02-22 | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |