CT HB05233 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-02 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-02 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To require health insurance coverage for mammograms provided by breast tomosynthesis.
Title
An Act Concerning Health Insurance Coverage For Tomosynthesis For Breast Cancer Screenings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 367 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 371 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - House - House Roll Call Vote 170 (Y: 139 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 371 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - House - House Roll Call Vote 170 (Y: 139 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-02 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2016-05-13 | Senate | Public Act 16-82 |
2016-05-04 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 538 |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate |
2016-04-28 | House | House Passed |
2016-04-15 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-04-15 | House | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2016-04-15 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-15 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-14 | House | Joint Favorable |
2016-04-08 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2016-03-30 | House | File Number 273 |
2016-03-30 | House | House Calendar Number 198 |
2016-03-30 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-03-30 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-22 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/16 5:00 PM |
2016-03-17 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-17 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2016-02-26 | House | Public Hearing 03/03 |
2016-02-16 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |