CT HB05204 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 21 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-08 - File Number 324
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-08 - File Number 324
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To provide for the registration of low-speed vehicles and the operation of such vehicles on highways with posted speed limits of thirty-five miles per hour or less.
Title
An Act Concerning The Operation Of Low-speed Vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-20 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | House | File Number 324 |
2024-04-08 | House | House Calendar Number 219 |
2024-04-08 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-08 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-01 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/24 12:00 PM |
2024-03-21 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-20 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2024-02-22 | House | Public Hearing 02/26 |
2024-02-21 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation |