CT HB05166 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1-1)
Status: Passed on May 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-31 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1-1)
Status: Passed on May 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-31 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To permit boards of selectmen of certain municipalities to enter into agreements to fix certain assessments.
Title
An Act Concerning Certain Municipal Agreements To Fix Assessments.
Sponsors
House Planning and Development Committee | Sen. Saud Anwar [D] | Rep. Jaime Foster [D] | Rep. Michael Winkler [D] |
Rep. Kenneth Gucker [D] | Rep. Geraldo Reyes [D] | Rep. Carol Hall [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 370 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - House - House Roll Call Vote 68 (Y: 131 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - House - House Roll Call Vote 68 (Y: 131 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-31 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2022-05-19 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2022-05-19 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2022-05-13 | House | Public Act 22-72 |
2022-05-04 | House | In Concurrence |
2022-05-04 | House | Senate Passed |
2022-04-22 | House | Senate Calendar Number 430 |
2022-04-22 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-20 | House | House Passed |
2022-03-21 | House | File Number 36 |
2022-03-21 | House | House Calendar Number 75 |
2022-03-21 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-03-21 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-14 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/22 12:00 PM |
2022-03-07 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-04 | House | Joint Favorable |
2022-02-18 | House | Public Hearing 02/25 |
2022-02-17 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |