CO SJR040 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-19 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-19 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Summary
Wild Horse & Burro Management CO Herds
Title
Wild Horse & Burro Management CO Herds
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Brown [R] | Sen. Al White [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer SJR 11-40 to the full senate (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer SJR 11-40 to the full senate (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer SJR 11-40 to the full senate (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer SJR 11-40 to the full senate (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer SJR 11-40 to the full senate (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-19 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2011-05-18 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-05-11 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2011-05-10 | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2011-05-10 | Introduced In House - Assigned to | |
2011-05-09 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2011-05-03 | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2011-04-28 | Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, and Energy Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2011-04-19 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, and Energy |