CO SJR038 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-07 - House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-07 - House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Home Rule Uniform Sales & Use Tax Definitions
Title
Home Rule Uniform Sales & Use Tax Definitions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer SJR14-038 to the full Senate (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-07 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-05-06 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2014-05-06 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |