CO SJR009 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-04 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-04 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Honor Colorado National Guard
Title
Honor Colorado National Guard
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-04 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-02-25 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-02-25 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 02/25/2014 - No Amendments |