CO SJM001 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-03 - House Third Reading Passed
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-03 - House Third Reading Passed
Summary
National Women's History Museum
Title
National Women's History Museum
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy Spence [R] | Sen. Nancy Todd [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-03 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2012-03-30 | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2012-03-30 | Introduced In House - Assigned to | |
2012-03-29 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2012-02-24 | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2012-02-24 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to |
Colorado State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/8D325981DF44E6F28725798A0068ADB8?Open |