CO SB253 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-2)
Status: Passed on June 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-24 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-2)
Status: Passed on June 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-24 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning license plates for veterans who have disabilities, and, in connection therewith, creating a license plate to honor women veterans with disabilities and making an appropriation.
Title
Women Veterans With Disabilities License Plate
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-01 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 52 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-253 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 21-253 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-253, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 21-253 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-253 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 21-253 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-253, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 21-253 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-24 | Governor Signed | |
2021-06-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-06-22 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-06-01 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-28 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-28 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-05-27 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2021-05-19 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |