CO SB243 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the continuation under the sunset law of the motorcycle operator safety training program by the director of the office of transportation safety in the department of transportation, and, in connection therewith, transferring the operation of the program to the chief of the state patrol beginning in 2018.
Title
Continue Motorcycle Operator Safety Training Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-01 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 17-243 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 17-243 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 17-243 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Refer Senate Bill 17-243 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 17-243 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 17-243 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 17-243 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Refer Senate Bill 17-243 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-25 | Governor Signed | |
2017-05-18 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-18 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-05-01 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-28 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-28 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-04-20 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2017-04-12 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee on Transportation Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation |