CO SB235 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-09 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-09 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Third Party Air Quality Modelers
Title
Third Party Air Quality Modelers
Sponsors
Sen. Angela Giron [D] | Rep. Sal Pace [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 11-235, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 11-235, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 11-235, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - cow and consent calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - cow and consent calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - cow and consent calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 11-235 to the Committee on Appropriations, as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 11-235 to the Committee on Appropriations, as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 11-235 to the Committee on Appropriations, as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 11-235, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 11-235, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 11-235, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - cow and consent calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - cow and consent calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - cow and consent calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 11-235 to the Committee on Appropriations, as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 11-235 to the Committee on Appropriations, as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 11-235 to the Committee on Appropriations, as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-09 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2011-05-18 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-18 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2011-05-16 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-05-11 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2011-05-10 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed | |
2011-05-06 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2011-05-05 | House Committee on Economic and Business Development Refer Amended to Appropriations | |
2011-05-03 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Economic and Business Development + Appropriations | |
2011-05-02 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2011-04-29 | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments | |
2011-04-29 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2011-04-27 | Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, and Energy Refer Amended to Appropriations | |
2011-04-11 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, and Energy + Appropriations |