CO SB212 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning reimbursement for health care services provided through telehealth, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reimbursement For Telehealth Services

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-13 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-13 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-12 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-212 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer Senate Bill 20-212, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer Senate Bill 20-212, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.008 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-212, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-212, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 20-212, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 20-212, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-06 Governor Signed
2020-06-19 Sent to the Governor
2020-06-19HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2020-06-19SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-06-13SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2020-06-12HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-06-11HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2020-06-11HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2020-06-10HouseHouse Committee on Health & Insurance Refer Amended to Appropriations
2020-06-09HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Health & Insurance + Appropriations
2020-06-09SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-06-08SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2020-06-06SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2020-06-02SenateSenate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations
2020-06-01SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb20-212
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_212_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_212_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_212_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_212_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_212_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_212_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/311937f0979751a28725857b006118d7-sb20-212-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/a2c5bb469df1114f8725857f004d9ea4-sb20-212-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/a2c5bb469df1114f8725857f004d9ea4-sb20-212-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/a2c5bb469df1114f8725857f004d9ea4-sb20-212-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/a2c5bb469df1114f8725857f004d9ea4-sb20-212-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-212vote53ce92
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/01b1c5a0837019fc8725858400029516-sb20-212-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/34dec974febb362e87258584005199a3-sb20-212-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-212vote62e3d7
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-212vote61c81d
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-212vote61b3c8
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/01b1c5a0837019fc8725858400029516-sb20-212-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/311937f0979751a28725857b006118d7-sb20-212-1-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments

feedback