CO SB188 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-2)
Status: Passed on May 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-2)
Status: Passed on May 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning behavioral health support for advocates in the criminal justice system, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Behavioral Health Support For Criminal Justice Advocates
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-10 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 56 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-188 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 22-188 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-188, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-188, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 22-188, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment E) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment D) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 22-188, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-188 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 22-188 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-188, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-188, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 22-188, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment E) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment D) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 22-188, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-20 | Governor Signed | |
2022-05-16 | Sent to the Governor | |
2022-05-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-05-16 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-05-10 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-05-09 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2022-05-09 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-04-20 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2022-04-13 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |