CO SB142 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 47-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-21 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 47-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-21 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning removing certain restrictions related to abortion services, and, in connection therewith, removing the requirement that the services be performed only at certain health care facilities and removing the requirement that only a physician perform the service.
Title
Health Care Access In Cases Of Rape Or Incest
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-11 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 39 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer Senate Bill 21-142 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 21-142, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment G) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment F). (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 21-142, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer Senate Bill 21-142 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 21-142, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment G) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment F). (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 21-142, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-21 | Governor Signed | |
2021-05-13 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-05-11 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-10 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-05 | House | House Committee on Health & Insurance Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-04-01 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health & Insurance |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |