CO SB131 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Motor Vehicle Registration Card Information

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor Vehicle Registration Card Information

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-04-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt a conceptual amendment to the rerevised version of Senate Bill 14-131 directing the Department of Revenue to mail one registration card with an address and one registration card without an address to motor vehicle owners, and to print a (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-131 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-131, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - This is a conceptual amendment no appropriation The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-07 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-131, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - This is a conceptual amendment no appropriation The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.002 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-131, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.001 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.002 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-131, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.001 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-06-06SenateGovernor Signed
2014-05-12SenateSent to the Governor
2014-05-12SenateSigned by the Speaker of the House
2014-05-12SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2014-04-21SenateSenate Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass
2014-04-15SenateHouse Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass
2014-04-08SenateFirst Conference Committee Result was to Adopt Rerevised w/ Amendments
2014-03-31SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Not Concur - Request Conference Committee
2014-03-28SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2014-03-26HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2014-03-25HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
2014-03-21HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily with Amendments - Floor
2014-03-19HouseHouse Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2014-03-13HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy
2014-03-13SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2014-03-12SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2014-03-11SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2014-03-07SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2014-02-12SenateSenate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations
2014-01-27SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/92E04FEBE60FD24187257C5B005CE956?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/92E04FEBE60FD24187257C5B005CE956/$FILE/131_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/92E04FEBE60FD24187257C5B005CE956/$FILE/131sjud_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/92E04FEBE60FD24187257C5B005CE956/$FILE/131sjudapp.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/92E04FEBE60FD24187257C5B005CE956/$FILE/131_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/92E04FEBE60FD24187257C5B005CE956/$FILE/131_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/92E04FEBE60FD24187257C5B005CE956/$FILE/131_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/92E04FEBE60FD24187257C5B005CE956/$FILE/131_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/92E04FEBE60FD24187257C5B005CE956/$FILE/131_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/8976CB97A482006887257C7D0076206F
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/88E89193B4885BF987257C7D00762BF3
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/26ADB710902210C387257C7D007627C4
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/7970D4DCD20742B387257C940056B554
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2014a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/2679BB7D01828BDB87257C940056F05F
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/8976CB97A482006887257C7D0076206F
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/88E89193B4885BF987257C7D00762BF3
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/26ADB710902210C387257C7D007627C4
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/7970D4DCD20742B387257C940056B554
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/2679BB7D01828BDB87257C940056F05F
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/BA421C722DBC3A8987257CA0006D04FC
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2014A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/690E56E2E0F799A487257CB40050D57E

Bill Comments

feedback