CO SB118 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-14)
Status: Passed on June 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-17 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the creation of an alternative response pilot program for county departments of human or social services to address a report of mistreatment of an at-risk adult, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alternative Response Mistreatment At-risk Adults

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-28 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 55 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-118 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 21-118 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-30 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-118, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-30 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-118, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 21-118, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 21-118, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-17 Governor Signed
2021-06-11 Sent to the Governor
2021-06-11HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2021-06-11SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-05-28HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-05-25HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2021-05-24HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2021-05-24HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2021-05-18HouseHouse Committee on Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2021-05-05HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services
2021-05-03SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-04-30SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2021-04-30SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2021-03-17SenateSenate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations
2021-02-23SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb21-118
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_118_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_118_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_118_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_118_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_118_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_118_enr.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB118_L.001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB118_J.001.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_sb118_00.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_sb0118_sen.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_sb0118_hse.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_sb118_f1.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/094b3d036dff6eaf8725869b006d3504-sb21-118-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/2f03ab81808756dd872586c7004e70b8-sb21-118-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/2f03ab81808756dd872586c7004e70b8-sb21-118-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-118vote5b47d2
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/094b3d036dff6eaf8725869b006d3504-sb21-118-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/ffc5aed232213090872586d9006b5879-sb21-118-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/7845606719435861872586df0056c1b0-sb21-118-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-118vote76918c

Bill Comments 750

feedback