CO SB078 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-13 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-13 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Rule Review Bill
Title
Rule Review Bill
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Gardner [R] | Sen. John Morse [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved Senate Bill 11-078 to the committee of the whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved Senate Bill 11-078 to the committee of the whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved Senate Bill 11-078 to the committee of the whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved Senate Bill 11-078 to the committee of the whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved Senate Bill 11-078 to the committee of the whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-13 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2011-05-12 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-12 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2011-05-12 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-05-11 | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Adhere | |
2011-05-11 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2011-05-10 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments | |
2011-05-06 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2011-05-04 | House Committee on Legal Services Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2011-04-28 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Legal Services | |
2011-04-26 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2011-04-25 | Senate Second Reading Passed | |
2011-04-20 | Senate Committee on Legal Services Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2011-01-24 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Legal Services |