CO SB059 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-21 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-21 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Statute Of Limitations Crime Related To Sex Crimes
Title
Statute Of Limitations Crime Related To Sex Crimes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-059, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-059, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-059, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-01-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-059, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-059, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-059, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-059, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-01-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-059, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-21 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2014-03-06 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-03-05 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2014-03-04 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2014-02-27 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2014-02-04 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-02-03 | House | Senate Third Reading Reconsidered - No Amendments |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-01-10 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |