CO SB054 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 47-21)
Status: Passed on March 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-21 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 47-21)
Status: Passed on March 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-21 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning transfers from the general fund to cash funds to be used to address wildland fires, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Transfers For Wildfire Mitigation And Response
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-054 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-054 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-054 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-054 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-21 | Governor Signed | |
2021-03-11 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-03-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-03-05 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-03-04 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-03-02 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-02-26 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations |