CO SB051 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Gaming & Lottery Intercepts State Debt
Title
Gaming & Lottery Intercepts State Debt
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - cow as amended (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - cow as amended (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - cow as amended (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-051, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-051, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-051, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-051, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-051, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-051, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - cow as amended (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - cow as amended (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-051, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-051, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-051, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-051, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-051, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-051, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-02 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2011-05-19 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-19 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2011-05-19 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-05-11 | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | |
2011-05-11 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2011-05-10 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments | |
2011-05-10 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2011-05-06 | House Committee on Appropriations Committee Vote - Final Action Failed | |
2011-05-04 | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations | |
2011-04-29 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance + Appropriations | |
2011-04-26 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2011-04-26 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2011-04-26 | Senate Third Reading Reconsidered | |
2011-04-25 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-04-19 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2011-04-15 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2011-02-03 | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations | |
2011-01-19 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance + Appropriations |