CO SB043 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-23 - House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-23 - House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Sharps Safe Disposal Manufacturer Plans
Title
Sharps Safe Disposal Manufacturer Plans
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to Postpone Indefinitely House Bill 11-043 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to Postpone Indefinitely House Bill 11-043 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to Postpone Indefinitely House Bill 11-043 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-043, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-043, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-043, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to Postpone Indefinitely House Bill 11-043 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to Postpone Indefinitely House Bill 11-043 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-043, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-043, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-043, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-23 | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely | |
2011-02-24 | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs | |
2011-02-21 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2011-02-18 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-02-08 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2011-02-03 | Senate Committee on Health and Human Services Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2011-01-19 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health and Human Services |