CO SB022 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-21 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning confirmation of receipt of a written request to perform an audit of a medicaid provider prior to the commencement of the audit.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Notification Requirements For Health Care Policy And Financing Audit

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-10 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 54 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 21-022 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-022, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-022, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 21-022, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 21-022, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-21 Governor Signed
2021-05-13 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-13HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2021-05-13SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-05-10HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-05-07HouseHouse Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-05-04HouseHouse Committee on Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2021-04-26HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services
2021-04-26SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-04-23SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2021-04-23SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2021-02-17SenateSenate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations
2021-02-16SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb21-022
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_022_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_022_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_022_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_022_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_022_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_022_enr.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB022_L.001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB022_L.003.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_sb022_00.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_sb0022_sen.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_sb022_r1.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/5291059469b80acb8725867f007706c2-sb21-022-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/5291059469b80acb8725867f007706c2-sb21-022-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/675d01680d2d6daa872586c00050a630-sb21-022-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-022vote5a9284
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/675d01680d2d6daa872586c00050a630-sb21-022-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/5441071fe0d11acc872586cb006b3d03-sb21-022-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-022vote62ba96

Bill Comments 750

feedback