CO HJR1017 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 60-36)
Status: Passed on June 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Signed by the President of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 60-36)
Status: Passed on June 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Signed by the President of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the Colorado legislative sportsmen's caucus, and, in connection therewith, designating April 21, 2022, "Sportsmen's Day".
Title
Designate April 21 Sportsmen's Day
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Consideration of Resolutions Resolution (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - House - House: RESOLUTIONS Res (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - House - House: RESOLUTIONS Res (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-06 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-06-03 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to |
2022-04-21 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-12 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2022-04-11 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to |