CO HB1432 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning prohibitions on discrimination in housing based on source of income.
Title
Prohibit Housing Discrimination Source Of Income
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-04 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 18-1432 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-04 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 18-1432 indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 36 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - House Local Government: Refer House Bill 18-1432, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - House Local Government: Refer House Bill 18-1432, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-04 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 18-1432 indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 36 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - House Local Government: Refer House Bill 18-1432, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - House Local Government: Refer House Bill 18-1432, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2018-05-03 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-05-02 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-05-02 | House | House Committee on Local Government Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-04-27 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Local Government |
2018-04-27 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Local Government |