CO HB1314 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
School Dist & Charter School Mill Levy Overrides
Title
School Dist & Charter School Mill Levy Overrides
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1314 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1314 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1314 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | House | Governor Signed |
2014-04-30 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-04-29 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-04-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |
2014-04-01 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-03-31 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-03-27 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2014-03-24 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2014-03-10 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |