CO HB1301 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Safe Routes To School Program State Funding
Title
Safe Routes To School Program State Funding
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1301 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.008 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1301, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-11 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-11 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.002 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-11 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1301, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1301, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.008 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1301, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-11 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-11 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.002 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-11 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1301, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1301, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-03 | House | Governor Signed |
2014-05-14 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-14 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2014-05-14 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-05-06 | House | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Senate Committee on Transportation Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation |
2014-04-14 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-11 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2014-04-11 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2014-03-19 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2014-03-03 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy + Appropriations |