CO HB1293 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Passed on May 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-15 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Passed on May 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-15 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning voluntary payroll deductions for state employees.
Title
Voluntary Payroll Deductions for State Employees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-19 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 45 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-19 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 45 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 24-1293 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 46 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 24-1293 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-19 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 45 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 24-1293 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 46 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 24-1293 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-15 | Governor Signed | |
2024-05-03 | Sent to the Governor | |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2024-05-02 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2024-04-19 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2024-04-17 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 04/15/2024 - No Amendments |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |
2024-03-04 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-03-01 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2024-02-28 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-02-14 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor |