CO HB1286 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-25 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-25 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Treasurer Loan Gifts Governor Receives For Display
Title
Treasurer Loan Gifts Governor Receives For Display
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1286 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1286 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1286 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-25 | House | Governor Signed |
2014-04-21 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-04-21 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-04-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |
2014-03-21 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-03-20 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-03-19 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2014-03-17 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2014-02-19 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |