CO HB1283 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-3)
Status: Passed on May 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-18 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-3)
Status: Passed on May 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-18 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning enhanced residential services for persons with behavioral health needs, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Youth And Family Behavioral Health Care
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-10 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 48 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 50 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1283, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1283, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 22-1283 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 57 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 51 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.006) (Y: 56 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1283, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 22-1283, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment H). (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 22-1283, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 50 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1283, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1283, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 22-1283 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 57 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 51 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.006) (Y: 56 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1283, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 22-1283, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment H). (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 22-1283, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-18 | Governor Signed | |
2022-05-16 | Sent to the Governor | |
2022-05-16 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-05-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-05-10 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |
2022-04-20 | House | House Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2022-04-19 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2022-04-19 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-04-05 | House | House Committee on Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2022-03-07 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services |