CO HB1282 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 42-6)
Status: Passed on May 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 42-6)
Status: Passed on May 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the creation of the innovative housing incentive program.
Title
The Innovative Housing Incentive Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1282 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 22-1282 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 45 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1282, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.008 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 22-1282, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 22-1282, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1282 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 22-1282 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 45 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1282, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.008 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 22-1282, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 22-1282, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-20 | Governor Signed | |
2022-05-09 | Sent to the Governor | |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-05-06 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |
2022-04-13 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-12 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2022-04-12 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-03-24 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2022-03-07 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor |