CO HB1274 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modify State Bank Management Limitations
Title
Modify State Bank Management Limitations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-19 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1274 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1274 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1274 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1274 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1274 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-07 | House | Governor Signed |
2014-03-31 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-03-31 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-03-27 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |
2014-03-06 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-03-05 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-03-04 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2014-02-27 | House | House Committee on Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2014-02-10 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development |