CO HB1268 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-11)
Status: Passed on June 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-18 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning a requirement that Colorado institutions of higher education study potential uses of emerging technologies to more effectively manage Colorado's water supply, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation conditioned on the receipt of matching funds from gifts, grants, and donations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Study Emerging Technologies For Water Management

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1268 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 21-1268 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1268, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Water: Refer House Bill 21-1268, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Water: Adopt Amendment L.002 B (Attachment B). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Water: Refer House Bill 21-1268, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-18 Governor Signed
2021-06-17 Sent to the Governor
2021-06-16HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2021-06-16SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-05-25SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-05-24SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2021-05-24SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2021-05-19SenateSenate Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2021-05-13SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture & Natural Resources
2021-05-12HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-05-11HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2021-05-11HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2021-04-26HouseHouse Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Water Refer Amended to Appropriations
2021-04-09HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Water

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb21-1268
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1268_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1268_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1268_rn2.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1268_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1268_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1268_enr.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1268_L.001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1268_J.001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1268_L.003.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1268_00.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1268_hse.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/82735f32cfa874bc872586c3006b4efa-hb21-1268-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/24f86c7ede43565f872586d2004f0bb8-hb21-1268-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/24f86c7ede43565f872586d2004f0bb8-hb21-1268-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1268vote55437e
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/82735f32cfa874bc872586c3006b4efa-hb21-1268-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/82735f32cfa874bc872586c3006b4efa-hb21-1268-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/f732f5765c5dd9c6872586da00720f2b-hb21-1268-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/b2748bc00a9bdec1872586df004eb974-hb21-1268-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1268vote54312c

Bill Comments 750

feedback