CO HB1230 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning marijuana hospitality establishments, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Marijuana Hospitality Establishments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-02 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 48 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 41 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1230 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reconsider amendment L.014. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reconsider amendment L.015. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1230, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1230, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.015 (Attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.010 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.014 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1230, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-16 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1230, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1230, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1230, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment Q) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-27 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment R) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-27 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment S) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-27 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 19-1230, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 19-1230, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-29 Governor Signed
2019-05-22SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-05-22 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-21HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-05-02SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2019-05-01SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-30SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-04-29SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-04-26SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-04-25SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
2019-04-18SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
2019-04-18HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-17HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2019-04-16HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-04-08HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
2019-03-27HouseHouse Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Amended to Finance
2019-03-08HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb19-1230
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1230_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1230_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1230_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1230_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1230_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1230_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/418f188ebf023001872583ca007e7a79-hb19-1230-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/418f188ebf023001872583ca007e7a79-hb19-1230-4-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/418f188ebf023001872583ca007e7a79-hb19-1230-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/418f188ebf023001872583ca007e7a79-hb19-1230-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/418f188ebf023001872583ca007e7a79-hb19-1230-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/5a3a67910ea73046872583d70006bba9-hb19-1230-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/b4e800a79fae1188872583de004b9c51-hb19-1230-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/b4e800a79fae1188872583de004b9c51-hb19-1230-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/5a3a67910ea73046872583d70006bba9-hb19-1230-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1230vote56fcf0
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/b9407fd9e2c48d5e872583e80000bf06-hb19-1230-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/bcfabc2ab12de86a872583e90008e20e-hb19-1230-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/09f1614c8fd143a2872583e700768f5a-hb19-1230-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/09f1614c8fd143a2872583e700768f5a-hb19-1230-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/09f1614c8fd143a2872583e700768f5a-hb19-1230-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/09f1614c8fd143a2872583e700768f5a-hb19-1230-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/b9407fd9e2c48d5e872583e80000bf06-hb19-1230-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/b9407fd9e2c48d5e872583e80000bf06-hb19-1230-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/b9407fd9e2c48d5e872583e80000bf06-hb19-1230-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1230vote67f50f
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1230vote7254b3
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1230vote7240c0

Bill Comments

feedback