CO HB1200 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the continuation of the HOA information and resource center, and, in connection therewith, implementing recommendations contained in the 2019 sunset report by the department of regulatory agencies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sunset Homeowners' Association Information And Resource Center

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1200 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1200 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 39 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1200 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-04 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1200 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 20-1200, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-30 Governor Signed
2020-06-22 Sent to the Governor
2020-06-19HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2020-06-19SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-06-11SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-06-10SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2020-06-10SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2020-06-10SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2020-06-09SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
2020-06-09HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-06-08HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2020-06-08HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2020-06-04HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2020-05-27HouseHouse Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Amended to Finance
2020-01-30HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb20-1200
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1200_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1200_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1200_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1200_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1200_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1200_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/190c8eb2de6c1fb38725857500707542-hb20-1200-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/08f90fa72268014c8725857d007a9c86-hb20-1200-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/4540247fce879d40872585810053a076-hb20-1200-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1200vote586cab
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/968f7205161973cc87258583007adb4a-hb20-1200-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/fb9085a6b32e459b8725858300664930-hb20-1200-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1200vote66394f

Bill Comments

feedback