CO HB1174 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the continuation under the sunset law of the board of mortgage loan originators, and, in connection therewith, adopting the legislative recommendations of the department of regulatory agencies as contained in the department's sunset report.
Title
Sunset Continue Board Of Mortgage Loan Originators
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1174 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 18-1174 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 48 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-06 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1174 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1174 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer House Bill 18-1174, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer House Bill 18-1174, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1174 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 18-1174 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 48 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-06 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1174 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 18-1174 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer House Bill 18-1174, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer House Bill 18-1174, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-29 | Governor Signed | |
2018-05-04 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-05-02 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |
2018-04-09 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-06 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-04-06 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-03-21 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2018-02-13 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Amended to Finance |
2018-02-02 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor |