CO HB1148 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-23 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-23 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning applications for registration to cultivate industrial hemp.
Title
Registration Of Industrial Hemp Cultivators
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Refer House Bill 17-1148 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 17-1148 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Refer House Bill 17-1148 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 17-1148 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-23 | Governor Signed | |
2017-03-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-03-21 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy |
2017-02-21 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-02-17 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over to 02/21/2017 - No Amendments |
2017-02-16 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-02-13 | House | House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-02-02 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources |