CO HB1137 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-17 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-17 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning measures to stabilize net metering credits calculated for an electric retail utility's purchase of electric output from a community solar garden.
Title
Solar Garden Net Metering Credits Stabilization
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 23-1137 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 45 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 23-1137, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - House - House Energy & Environment: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - House - House Energy & Environment: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 5 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 23-1137 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 45 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 23-1137, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - House - House Energy & Environment: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - House - House Energy & Environment: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 5 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-17 | Governor Signed | |
2023-04-14 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-04-12 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |
2023-02-21 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-02-17 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2023-02-14 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2023-02-09 | House | House Committee on Energy & Environment Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2023-01-31 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Energy & Environment |