CO HB1135 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-10 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-10 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Voter Preregistration At Age 16
Title
Voter Preregistration At Age 16
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.004 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW AMD The motion passed on a vote of 4-3. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - L.010 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.004 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW AMD The motion passed on a vote of 4-3. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - L.010 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1135, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt Amendment L.009 (Attachment A) to House Bill 13-1135 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt Amendment L.009 (Attachment A) to House Bill 13-1135 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1135, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1135, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1135, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 13-1135, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations with a favorable recommendation (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved prepared amendment L.002 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved prepared amendment L.001 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved prepared amendment L.002 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved prepared amendment L.001 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 13-1135, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations with a favorable recommendation (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW AMD The motion passed on a vote of 4-3. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - L.010 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.004 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW AMD The motion passed on a vote of 4-3. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - L.010 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1135, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt Amendment L.009 (Attachment A) to House Bill 13-1135 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt Amendment L.009 (Attachment A) to House Bill 13-1135 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1135, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1135, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1135, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 13-1135, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations with a favorable recommendation (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved prepared amendment L.002 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved prepared amendment L.001 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved prepared amendment L.002 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved prepared amendment L.001 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 13-1135, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations with a favorable recommendation (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-10 | House | Governor Action - Signed |
2013-04-30 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-04-22 | House | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2013-03-12 | House | House Third Reading Passed |
2013-03-11 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-03-08 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-05 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-03-01 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2013-02-04 | House | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2013-01-18 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |