CO HB1111 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Dept Of Ag Livestock Confidential Data
Title
Dept Of Ag Livestock Confidential Data
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1111 to the Committee of the Whole, without amendment, and with a recommendation that it be added to the consent calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1111 to the Committee of the Whole, without amendment, and with a recommendation that it be added to the consent calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1111, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1111, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1111 to the Committee of the Whole, without amendment, and with a recommendation that it be added to the consent calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1111, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1111, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-06 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2011-03-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-03-29 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2011-03-29 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-03-23 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2011-03-22 | Senate Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-17 | Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, and Energy Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2011-03-02 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, and Energy | |
2011-02-22 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2011-02-21 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments | |
2011-02-17 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2011-02-07 | House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2011-01-21 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources |