CO HB1093 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establish Creative District Community Loan Fund
Title
Establish Creative District Community Loan Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-25 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1093 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.010 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - This is a conceptual amendment. Amend page 2, line 9, strike "FINANCE" and substitute "FINANCIAL." The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1093, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-11 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1093, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-11 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1093, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1093, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.010 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - This is a conceptual amendment. Amend page 2, line 9, strike "FINANCE" and substitute "FINANCIAL." The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1093, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-11 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1093, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-11 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1093, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1093, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-29 | House | Governor Signed |
2014-05-14 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-14 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-05-14 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2014-05-02 | House | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |
2014-04-15 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-14 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2014-04-11 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2014-02-04 | House | House Committee on Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2014-01-14 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development |