CO HB1082 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-13 - House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-13 - House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Time Limit On Mental Health Disciplinary Actions
Title
Time Limit On Mental Health Disciplinary Actions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-13 - House - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 15-1082 indefinitely (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment E) (Y: 6 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment F) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment J) as a substitute to amendment L.006 (Y: 4 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1082 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment E) (Y: 6 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment F) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment J) as a substitute to amendment L.006 (Y: 4 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1082 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-13 | House | House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Postpone Indefinitely |
2015-02-09 | House | House Second Reading Re-referred to Public Health Care & Human Services - No Amendments |
2015-02-03 | House | House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2015-01-13 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services |