CO HB1070 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-1)
Status: Passed on March 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-17 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-1)
Status: Passed on March 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-17 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning early childhood development service districts, and, in connection therewith, allowing a district to include in its service area less than all of the territory of an existing taxing district and to accept gifts, grants, and donations.
Title
Special Districts Early Childhood Development
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 22-1070 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 44 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 22-1070 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 22-1070 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 44 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 22-1070 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-17 | Governor Signed | |
2022-03-11 | Sent to the Governor | |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-03-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |
2022-02-24 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-02-23 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-02-17 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-01-18 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |