CO HB1064 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-24 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-24 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a training program to prevent child sexual abuse for persons who work with young children in some capacity as part of their employment, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Training Program Prevention Child Sexual Abuse
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1064 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 18-1064 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-20 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-19 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1064, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment K). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-01-30 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 18-1064, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 18-1064, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1064 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 18-1064 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-20 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-19 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1064, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment K). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-01-30 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 18-1064, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 18-1064, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-24 | Governor Signed | |
2018-05-18 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-05-18 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2018-04-20 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-19 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-04-19 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-01-30 | House | House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2018-01-10 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services |