CO HB1037 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Not Concur - Request Conference Committee
Hearing: Apr 29 @ 8:00 am in Room 0107
Hearing: Apr 29 @ 8:00 am in Room HCR 0107
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Not Concur - Request Conference Committee
Hearing: Apr 29 @ 8:00 am in Room 0107
Hearing: Apr 29 @ 8:00 am in Room HCR 0107
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning reducing the harm caused by substance use disorders.
Title
Substance Use Disorders Harm Reduction
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-19 - House - House: Senate Amendments Not Cncr (Y: 52 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 24-1037 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 44 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 24-1037, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment M). (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 24-1037, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 24-1037 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 44 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 24-1037, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment M). (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 24-1037, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Not Concur - Request Conference Committee |
2024-04-04 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |
2024-03-04 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-03-01 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2024-02-23 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2024-02-20 | House | House Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-01-10 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health & Human Services |